US HR928 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for designating the month of April 2020 as "Second Chance Month". This resolution expresses support for designating Second Chance Month to promote awareness of unnecessary legal and social barriers that prevent an individual with a criminal record from becoming a productive member of society.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for designating the month of April 2020 as "Second Chance Month".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2020-04-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR210 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR102 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SR549 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1875-1876)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback