US HR949 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of Public Service Recognition Week and expresses gratitude to federal workers for their service during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States during Public Service Recognition Week, the week of May 3 through 9, 2020.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR353 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR180 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575)
SR569 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344)
SR180 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575)
SR569 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/949/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres949/BILLS-116hres949ih.pdf |