US HR967 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 965) authorizing remote voting by proxy in the House of Representatives and providing for official remote committee proceedings during a public health emergency due to a novel coronavirus, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6800) making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from May 19, 2020, through July 21, 2020; and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 965) authorizing remote voting by proxy in the House of Representatives and providing for official remote committee proceedings during a public health emergency due to a novel coronavirus, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6800) making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from May 19, 2020, through July 21, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 965) authorizing remote voting by proxy in the House of Representatives and providing for official remote committee proceedings during a public health emergency due to a novel coronavirus, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6800) making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from May 19, 2020, through July 21, 2020; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 106 (Y: 207 N: 199 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 105 (Y: 219 N: 182 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-05-15HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 207 - 199 (Roll No. 106). (text: CR H2007-2008)
2020-05-15HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 182 (Roll No. 105). (consideration: CR H2018)
2020-05-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 967.
2020-05-15HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2007-2019)
2020-05-14HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 79.
2020-05-14HouseRule provides for one hour of debate on H. Res. 965 and two hours of debate on H.R. 6800.
2020-05-14HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-421, by Mr. McGovern.

Same As/Similar To

HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR965 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1053 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback