US HR974 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Pending: House Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Pending: House Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates the Hong Kong national security law proposed by China as a violation of China's international obligations. The resolution calls on the United States to use all diplomatic means available to dissuade China from passing the law and rally free nations to stand with the people of Hong Kong.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Hong Kong national security law proposed by the Government of the People's Republic of China would violate the obligations of that Government under the 1984 Sino-British Joint Declaration and the Hong Kong Basic Law, and calling upon all free countries of the world to stand with the people of Hong Kong.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] |
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2020-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR596 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 05/21/2020 CR S2606-2607)
Subjects
Asia
China
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Espionage and treason
Hong Kong
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Protest and dissent
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Travel and tourism
China
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Espionage and treason
Hong Kong
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Protest and dissent
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/974/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres974/BILLS-116hres974ih.pdf |