US SB10 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the South Florida ecosystem. An algal bloom is a rapid growth of algae that may create toxic or hypoxic (severely low-oxygen) conditions that are harmful to humans, animals, aquatic ecosystems, and the economy. The Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia must assess potential approaches to reduce harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the ecosystem. The task force must also submit a plan, based on the assessment, for reducing, mitigating, and controlling harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the region.
Title
South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-257. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB335 (Same As) 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Everglades
Florida
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Everglades
Florida
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality