US SB1057 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Interior to carry out the Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan which was submitted to Congress on March 19, 2019, by Arizona, California, Colorado, Nevada, New Mexico, Utah, and Wyoming. Interior must execute the plan without delay and operate applicable Colorado River System reservoirs accordingly.
Title
Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2291-2292; text: CR S2295) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2030 (Related) 2019-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Arizona
California
Colorado
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Nevada
New Mexico
Utah
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wyoming
California
Colorado
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Nevada
New Mexico
Utah
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wyoming