US SB1064 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy to conduct a study on the national security impacts of building ethane and other natural gas liquids petrochemical infrastructure in the vicinity of the Marcellus, Utica, and Rogersville shale plays located in the Appalachian region of the United States. The study must include an examination of the proposed infrastructure, including an identification of the potential benefits to national and economic security and the risks posed by foreign ownership and control of U.S. domestic petrochemical resources.
Title
Appalachian Energy for National Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177. |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment. With written report No. 116-75. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international corporations
Government studies and investigations
Oil and gas
Rural conditions and development
U.S. and foreign investments
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international corporations
Government studies and investigations
Oil and gas
Rural conditions and development
U.S. and foreign investments