US SB1069 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-223. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-223. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for and revises the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration's (NOAA's) Digital Coast program. (The program currently exists under NOAA to provide data, tools, and training that communities use to manage their coastal resources.) NOAA must focus on filling data needs and gaps for critical coastal management issues and support continued improvement in existing efforts to coordinate the acquisition and integration of key data sets needed for coastal management. NOAA may enter into financial agreements and collect fees to carry out the program. Additionally, NOAA may establish publicly available tools that track ocean and Great Lakes economy data for each coastal state.
Title
Digital Coast Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-223. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1069 by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7188) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5739-5740) |
2020-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1069. |
2020-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5739-5741) |
2020-11-16 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-10-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6000) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 481. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-234. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2189 (Same As) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Department of Commerce
Earth sciences
Executive agency funding and structure
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
Department of Commerce
Earth sciences
Executive agency funding and structure
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates