US SB1100 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to institute a program for the disclosure of taxpayer information for third-party income verification through the Internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to institute a program for the disclosure of taxpayer information for third-party income verification through the Internet.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1957 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 75.
HB2007 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback