US SB1129 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - An errata sheet on written report No. 115-89 was printed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - An errata sheet on written report No. 115-89 was printed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2017 This bill authorizes: (1) appropriations for the Coast Guard for FY2018-FY2019, and (2) a specified level of end-of-year strength for active duty personnel and military training student loads for such fiscal years. The bill addresses: (1) training for public safety personnel, (2) service member benefits for Coast Guard personnel, (3) contracts to procure three National Security Cutters, and (4) the Coast Guard Reserve Officers' Training Corps Program. The bill revises or sets forth policies relating to the Coast Guard, including Coast Guard advisory committees, numbering for undocumented barges, aids to navigation, requirements for personal flotation devices, the alternate safety compliance program, vessel certification, the installation and use of engine cut-off switches on recreational vessels, visual distress signals for recreational boats, auxiliary craft requirements, the Coast Guard's inland waterway and river tenders fleet, arctic planning, maritime security, acquisition workforce expedited hiring authority, drawbridges, incentive contracts for Coast Guard Yard or Coast Guard industrial establishments, Coast Guard health care professionals, land exchanges, shipyards, and waivers for certain contracts.
Title
Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | An errata sheet on written report No. 115-89 was printed. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-89. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2637 (Related) 2017-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB2518 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2518 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adoption and foster care
Advisory bodies
Alaska
Aquatic ecology
Arctic and polar regions
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Currency
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Maritime Commission
First responders and emergency personnel
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health personnel
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Judicial review and appeals
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Louisiana
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Mississippi River
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Pacific Ocean
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Pipelines
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
Roads and highways
Service animals
Student aid and college costs
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Worker safety and health
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adoption and foster care
Advisory bodies
Alaska
Aquatic ecology
Arctic and polar regions
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Currency
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Maritime Commission
First responders and emergency personnel
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health personnel
Higher education
Hydrology and hydrography
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Judicial review and appeals
Land transfers
Licensing and registrations
Louisiana
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Mississippi River
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Pacific Ocean
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Pipelines
Public contracts and procurement
Public participation and lobbying
Roads and highways
Service animals
Student aid and college costs
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Worker safety and health