US SB1130 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health and Human Services to develop and continue programs addressing sudden unexpected infant death and sudden unexpected death in childhood, including by supporting data systems related to such deaths and awarding grants to support sudden unexpected death review programs.
Title
Scarlett's Sunshine on Sudden Unexpected Death Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-273. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1130 by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7555-7556) |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | H.Amdt.909 On agreeing to the Dingell amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | H.Amdt.909 Amendment (A001) offered by Mrs. Dingell. (consideration: CR H7132-7133; text: CR H7132-7133) |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7132-7133; text: CR H7132) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-05-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2561-2562) |
2020-05-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.1590 Amendment SA 1590 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.1590 Amendment SA 1590 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S2561-2562; text: CR S2561-2562) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2561) |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2560-2562) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 284. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2271 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product safety and quality
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Genetics
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product safety and quality