US SB1207 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies and modifies the Navajo Utah Water Rights Settlement Agreement negotiated between the Navajo Nation, the United States, and Utah. The agreement gives the Navajo Nation the right to use water from sources located within Utah and adjacent to or encompassed within the boundaries of the Navajo Reservation resulting in depletions not to exceed a specified amount annually. The Navajo water rights shall be held in trust by the United States for the use and benefit of Navajo Nation and shall not be subject to forfeiture or abandonment. The Navajo Nation shall have authority to allocate, distribute, and lease the water rights for any use on or off its reservation in accordance with the agreement. The Department of the Interior shall establish and manage the Navajo Utah Settlement Trust Fund, with amounts available for withdrawal by the Navajo Nation for planning, designing, constructing, operating, maintaining, and replacing Navajo water development projects. The bill also specifies waivers and releases that must be executed in order for the settlement to be binding and effective.
Title
Navajo Utah Water Rights Settlement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-79. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB644 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Government trust funds
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Native Americans
Utah
Water use and supply
Government trust funds
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Native Americans
Utah
Water use and supply