US SB1211 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing Underdeveloped and Tribally Operated Streets Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing Underdeveloped and Tribally Operated Streets Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-04-11SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

SB207 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback