US SB1215 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2437-2438)
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2020 This bill authorizes FY2020 appropriations and sets forth policies for Department of Defense (DOD) programs and activities, including military personnel strengths and military construction. It does not provide budget authority, which is provided in subsequent appropriations legislation. The bill authorizes appropriations to DOD for Procurement, including aircraft, weapons and tracked combat vehicles, shipbuilding and conversion, missiles, and space procurement; Research, Development, Test, and Evaluation; Operation and Maintenance; Working Capital Funds; the Joint Urgent Operational Needs Fund; Chemical Agents and Munitions Destruction; Drug Interdiction and Counter-Drug Activities; the Defense Inspector General; the Defense Health Program; the Armed Forces Retirement Home; the Space Force; and Overseas Contingency Operations. The bill also authorizes the FY2020 personnel strengths for active duty and reserve forces and sets forth policies regarding military personnel; compensation and other personnel benefits; health care; acquisition policy and management; DOD organization and management; civilian personnel matters; matters relating to foreign nations; strategic programs, cyber, and intelligence matters; and the establishment of the Space Force within the Air Force. The bill authorizes appropriations and sets forth policies regarding military construction for the Army, Navy, Air Force, defense agencies, the North Atlantic Treaty Organization Security Investment Program, and Guard and Reserve Forces facilities. The bill authorizes appropriations for base realignment and closure activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2437-2438)

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.
HB2880 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB2371 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2840 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Afghanistan
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Armed Forces Retirement Home
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Australia
Aviation and airports
Canada
Chemical and biological weapons
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Defense spending
Denmark
Department of Defense
Disability and paralysis
Disaster relief and insurance
District of Columbia
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Europe
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Firearms and explosives
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government liability
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Indian lands and resources rights
Industrial facilities
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Iraq
Italy
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Landlord and tenant
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine pollution
Marshall Islands
Maryland
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military history
Military law
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Motor vehicles
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National Guard and reserves
Netherlands
Norway
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Postal service
Property tax
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Service animals
Sex offenses
Small business
South Korea
Spacecraft and satellites
Sports and recreation facilities
State and local taxation
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Texas
Transportation costs
Turkey
United Kingdom
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Virginia
Water quality

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback