US SB1218 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires review of the service records of certain decorated World War I veterans to determine whether they should be awarded the Medal of Honor for valor during that war. Specifically, the Secretary of the Army or the Secretary of the Navy shall review the records of any African American, Asian American, Hispanic American, Jewish American, or Native American war veteran who was recommended for review by a veterans service organization and who, for action that occurred between April 6, 1917, and November 11, 1918 was awarded the Distinguished Service Cross or the Navy Cross, was awarded the Croix de Guerre with Palm by the government of France, or was recommended for a Medal of Honor. If a review indicates that the award is warranted, a recommendation shall be made to the President to award the Medal of Honor to that veteran.
Title
World War I Valor Medals Review Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Military history
Personnel records
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Military history
Personnel records
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1218/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1218/BILLS-116s1218is.pdf |