US SB1228 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for enhanced penalties for pirate radio, and for other purposes.
Title
PIRATE Act Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-01-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S81; text: CR S81) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-178. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB583 (Same As) 2020-01-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-109. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Science, technology, communications