US SB123 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to contract with a nonfederal organization to conduct a quality management review of hospital care or medical services furnished by each Veterans Health Administration (VHA) provider whose license was terminated by a state licensing board based upon care or services provided in a non-VHA facility. If a review determines that the standard of care was not met, the VA shall notify the individual who received such care or services.
Title
Ensuring Quality Care for Our Veterans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4079-4080; text: CR S4080) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4858 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health personnel
Hospital care
Licensing and registrations
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health personnel
Hospital care
Licensing and registrations
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care