US SB1245 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises energy performance requirements for federal buildings, including by requiring agencies to begin installing energy and conservation measures that are life-cycle cost effective.
Title
All-of-the-Above Federal Building Energy Conservation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 116-117. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2664 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3962 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
HB3962 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Water use and supply
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Water use and supply