US SB1262 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates specified Bureau of Land Management land in Oregon as the Rogue Canyon and Molalla Recreation Areas. Approximately 59,512 acres of specified federal land are added to the Wild Rogue Wilderness in Oregon. Such recreation areas and lands are withdrawn from (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under all laws pertaining to mineral leasing, geothermal leasing, or mineral materials. The bill also withdraws identified federally owned lands and interests within the Hunter Creek, Pistol River Headwaters, or the Rough and Ready and Baldface Creeks Mineral Withdrawal Proposal in Curry County and Josephine County, Oregon.
Title
Oregon Recreation Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 382. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB86 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB992 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB992 (Related) 2019-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
Land use and conservation
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats