US SB127 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S226)
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S226)
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) and the city of Vallejo, California, to enter into an agreement to transfer Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, to the VA to be maintained as a national shrine.
Title
A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter into an agreement with the city of Vallejo, California, for the transfer of Mare Island Naval Cemetery in Vallejo, California, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S226) |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB2983 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6039 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB2983 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6039 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
California
Cemeteries and funerals
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
California
Cemeteries and funerals
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/127/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s127/BILLS-116s127is.pdf |