US SB1272 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 575 Dexter Street in Central Falls, Rhode Island, as the "Elizabeth Buffum Chace Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 575 Dexter Street in Central Falls, Rhode Island, as the "Elizabeth Buffum Chace Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 575 Dexter Street in Central Falls, Rhode Island, as the "Elizabeth Buffum Chace Post Office".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-08-02HouseReceived in the House.
2019-07-31SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-30SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204; text: CR S5204)
2019-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 121.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2451 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback