US SB1287 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that grants awarded through the Maritime Administration's small shipyard grant program must be used for projects that are carried out using materials produced or manufactured in the United States, with specified exceptions.
Title
Strengthening Buy America for Small Shipyard Grants Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1439 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB3409 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB3409 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Buy American requirements
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1287/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1287/BILLS-116s1287is.pdf |