US SB1296 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PRIVATE Act Protecting the Rights of IndiViduals Against Technological Exploitation Act This bill amends the Uniform Code of Military Justice to prohibit a person from knowingly and wrongfully broadcasting or distributing an intimate visual image of a private area of another individual who is at least 18 years old, who is identifiable from the image or from information displayed in connection with the image, and who does not explicitly consent, if the person knows or reasonably should have known that: the image was made under circumstances in which the individual depicted retained a reasonable expectation of privacy regarding any broadcast or distribution of such image; and the broadcast or distribution of the intimate visual image is likely to cause harm, harassment, intimidation, emotional distress, or financial loss for the individual depicted or to harm substantially the depicted individual's health, safety, business, calling, career, financial condition, reputation, or personal relationships. The perpetrator of such offense is guilty of wrongful distribution of intimate visual images and shall by punished as a court-martial may direct.
Title
PRIVATE Act Protecting the Rights of IndiViduals Against Technological Exploitation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2052 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1519 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1886-1892, S1892-1931)
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1519 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1886-1892, S1892-1931)
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Military law
Photography and imaging
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Assault and harassment offenses
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Military law
Photography and imaging
Right of privacy
Sex offenses