US SB1298 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to increase, for taxable years beginning after 2013: (1) the limitation on the amount of the expensing allowance for depreciable business assets from $25,000 to $200,000, and (2) the threshold amount over which such expensing allowance is reduced from $200,000 to $800,000.
Title
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to adjust the limits on expensing of certain depreciable business assets.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1342 (Related) 2013-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4457 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
HB4501 (Related) 2014-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4457 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
HB4501 (Related) 2014-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1298/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1298/BILLS-113s1298is.pdf |