US SB130 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act This bill establishes requirements for the degree of care a health care practitioner must exercise in the event a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion. A health care practitioner who is present must (1) exercise the same degree of care as reasonably provided to another child born alive at the same gestational age, and (2) immediately admit the child to a hospital. The bill also requires a health care practitioner or other employee to immediately report any failure to comply with this requirement to law enforcement. A person who violates the requirements is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both. Additionally, an individual who intentionally kills or attempts to kill a child born alive is subject to prosecution for murder. The bill bars the criminal prosecution of a mother of a child born alive for conspiracy to violate these provisions, for being an accessory after the fact, or for concealment of felony. A woman who undergoes an abortion or attempted abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
2019-01-15SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB311 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 41. Record Vote Number: 58. (CR S1136)
HB962 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback