US SB1320 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently reauthorizes the Department of Defense (DOD) Mentor-Protege Program, designed to help major defense contractors facilitate the participation of disadvantaged small business concerns as subcontractors and suppliers. The DOD Office of Small Business Programs shall establish performance goals and conduct periodic reviews of approved agreements between mentors and proteges.
Title
Defense Small Business Advancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2794 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB3087 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB3087 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1320/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1320/BILLS-116s1320is.pdf |