US SB1327 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the tax credit for the production of refined coal. With respect to refined coal production facilities that do not produce steel industry fuel, the bill (1) allows facilities that were placed in service before January 1, 2012, to claim the credit for an additional 10 years, and (2) establishes an additional 3-year period (after December 31, 2018, and before January 1, 2022), during which facilities may qualify for the credit by being placed in service.
Title
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the credit for production of refined coal.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1327/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1327/BILLS-116s1327is.pdf |