US SB1333 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Stopping Improper Payments to Deceased People Act This bill requires the Social Security Administration (SSA) to pay to states their reasonable costs for compiling and sharing records of deaths with the SSA. Under current law, the SSA is not required to pay the states but may choose to do so. The SSA may share the death data with federal and state agencies for various purposes. Such purposes include ensuring proper payments of benefits and tax administration duties. The Office of Management and Budget shall develop guidance for federal agencies that collect death data, and the Department of the Treasury and the Department of Health and Human Services shall jointly develop a plan to assist and states, local agencies, and Indian tribes in providing the data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stopping Improper Payments to Deceased People Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
2019-06-25SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-49.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-06SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2543 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback