US SB1370 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Ordered held at desk by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act (Sec. 2) This bill treats certain military survivor benefits that are received by children as earned income of the child for the purposes of the kiddie tax (the tax on the unearned income of children). This has the effect of exempting the benefits from such tax. The bill applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateOrdered held at desk by unanimous consent.
2019-05-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2985; text: CR S2985)
2019-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-05-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB2481 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2716 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback