US SB1380 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-182. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-182. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a federal judge in criminal proceedings to issue an order confirming the obligation of the prosecutor to disclose exculpatory evidence.
Title
Due Process Protections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-182. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-09 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4582) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1380. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4582-4583) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-05-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2559) |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2559) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Due process and equal protection
Evidence and witnesses
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Due process and equal protection
Evidence and witnesses