US SB1388 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Office of Management and Budget, in coordination with the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, the Department of Homeland Security, and the General Services Administration, to establish and implement a counterintelligence training program for officials with supply chain risk management responsibilities at executive agencies. The program shall be designed to prepare such personnel to identify and mitigate counterintelligence threats that arise during the acquisition and use of information and communications technology.
Title
Supply Chain Counterintelligence Training Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-11-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6483; text: CR S6483-6484) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 191. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-87. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Public contracts and procurement
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Public contracts and procurement