US SB1419 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs agencies to publish advance notice of a proposed rulemaking at least 90 days before publishing a notice of proposed rulemaking for a major rule that the Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs (OIRA) determines is likely to impose (1) an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more; (2) a major increase in costs or prices for consumers, individual industries, government agencies, or geographic regions; or (3) significant adverse effects on competition, employment, investment, productivity, innovation, health, safety, the environment, or the ability of U.S. enterprises to compete with foreign-based enterprises. The advance notice must include, among other information, a written a description of the rule and the legal authority under which it is proposed; and solicit and provide a period of at least 60 days for submission of written data, views, and argument from interested persons. Any difference between such advance notice and the notice of proposed rulemaking may not be considered arbitrary, capricious, an abuse of discretion, or otherwise not in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act. Advance notice is not required if the proposing agency is not required to publish notice of proposed rulemaking or OIRA finds that such advance notice is not in the public interest or duplicative of another statutory requirement. Such a determination made by OIRA is not subject to judicial review.
Title
Early Participation in Regulations Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-88. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Regulatory Affairs and Federal Management. Hearings held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Economic performance and conditions
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Industrial policy and productivity
Inflation and prices
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Economic performance and conditions
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Industrial policy and productivity
Inflation and prices