US SB1420 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 147.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 147.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires agencies, when publishing a proposed or final major rule, to include a framework for assessing whether the rule achieves its regulatory objective. An agency must assess a rule in the time frame included in the framework. The assessment must compare the rule's anticipated and actual benefits and costs. The bill defines a major rule as a rule likely to cause (1) an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more; (2) a major increase in costs or prices; or (3) significant adverse effects on competition, employment, investment, productivity, innovation, health, safety, the environment, or the ability of U.S.-based enterprises to compete with foreign-based enterprises.
Title
SMART Act of 2019 Setting Manageable Analysis Requirements in Text Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 147. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-55. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Regulatory Affairs and Federal Management. Hearings held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Economic performance and conditions
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Economic performance and conditions
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals