US SB1430 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a representative payee (i.e., a person designated to receive payments on behalf of a minor, a mentally incompetent individual, or an individual under other legal disability) from embezzling or converting the amounts received from certain retirement funds. If the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) determines that a representative payee has embezzled or converted payments from the Civil Service Retirement System or the Federal Employees Retirement System for a use other than the benefit of the individual on whose behalf such payments were received, OPM shall (1) revoke the certification for payment of benefits to the representative payee, and (2) certify payment to another representative payee or to the individual.
Title
Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-11-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6766) |
2019-11-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.1251 Amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.1251 Amendment SA 1251 proposed by Senator Fischer for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S6766; text: CR S6766) To make certain corrections. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6764-6766; text: CR S6765) |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 148. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-56. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5214 (Related) 2020-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-126. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics