US SB1458 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to establish an outdoor recreation legacy partnership program under which Interior may award grants to eligible entities (i.e., states, their political subdivisions, special purpose districts, and Indian Tribes) for projects to (1) acquire land and water for parks and other outdoor recreation purposes, and (2) develop new or renovate existing outdoor recreation facilities. A grant recipient may use the grant to acquire land or water providing outdoor recreation opportunities to the public. A grant may also be used to develop or renovate outdoor recreational facilities, with priority given to projects that create or significantly enhance access to park and recreational opportunities in an urban neighborhood or community, engage and empower underserved communities and youth, provide opportunities for youth employment or job training, establish or expand public-private partnerships, and take advantage of coordination among various levels of government. Grant funds may not be used for certain purposes, including grant administration costs, operation and maintenance activities, athletic facilities, or acquisition of lands or interests that restrict access to particular persons.
Title
Outdoors for All Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5986 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB1334 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB4512 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1334 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB4512 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Energy revenues and royalties
Gulf of Mexico
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Youth employment and child labor
Energy revenues and royalties
Gulf of Mexico
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1458/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1458/BILLS-116s1458is.pdf |