US SB149 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a Senior Scams Prevention Advisory Group, which shall create model educational materials to educate employees of retailers, financial-services companies, and wire-transfer companies on how to identify and prevent scams that affect seniors.
Title
Stop Senior Scams Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2898; text: CR S2898) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 393. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-182. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2610 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aging
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Retail and wholesale trades
Aging
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Retail and wholesale trades