US SB1491 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits predispute arbitration agreements that require arbitration of an employment dispute. It allows a postdispute arbitration agreement if the employee enters into it voluntarily without coercion and is informed in writing of rights and protections under such agreement. An employer may not retaliate against an employee for refusing to enter into an agreement for arbitrating an employment dispute.
Title
Restoring Justice for Workers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1443 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2148 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2749 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2750 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB1082 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2148 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2749 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2750 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB1082 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1491/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1491/BILLS-116s1491is.pdf |