US SB150 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to increase the federal minimum wage for regular employees over a 7-year period, for tipped employees, and for newly hired employees who are less than 20 years old. The bill sets forth a schedule of annual increases in the federal minimum wage for individuals with disabilities. The Department of Labor shall no longer issue special certificates for the payment of subminimum wages to such individuals after the final wage increase under this bill for such individuals takes effect. Labor shall provide, upon request, technical assistance and information to employers to: (1) help them transition their practices to comply with wage increases and other requirements under this bill for individuals with disabilities, and (2) ensure continuing employment opportunities for such individuals. The bill eliminates the separate minimum wage requirements for tipped, newly hired, and disabled employees. After a specified period, these employees shall be paid the same minimum wage as regular employees. Labor must publish any increase in the minimum wage in the Federal Register and on its website 60 days before it takes effect.
Title
Raise the Wage Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Same As) 2019-07-22 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
HR492 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4306 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR492 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4306 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Wages and earnings
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s150/BILLS-116s150is.pdf |