US SB1540 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Election Security Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Security Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2722 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR460 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2053 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback