US SB1562 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to clarify the obligation to report acts of foreign election influence and require implementation of compliance and reporting systems by Federal campaigns to detect and report such acts.
Title
Foreign Influence Reporting in Elections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3873 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1562/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1562/BILLS-116s1562is.pdf |