US SB1570 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of certain Bureau of Reclamation facilities and federal land, excluding facilities and land in California, to convey water to recharge certain aquifers.
Title
Aquifer Recharge Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-155. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2871 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB5217 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB5217 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
Hydrology and hydrography
Land use and conservation
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Land use and conservation
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Watersheds