US SB1622 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds five fentanyl analogues and the entire category of fentanyl-related substances to schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Stopping Overdoses of Fentanyl Analogues Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2935 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1622/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1622/BILLS-116s1622is.pdf |