US SB168 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renames the Indiana Dunes National Lakeshore as the Indiana Dunes National Park. The bill redesignates the 1.6-mile Miller-Woods Trail within the park as the Paul H. Douglas Trail.
Title
Indiana Dunes National Park Act
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB648 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16.
HB684 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
HB684 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HJR31 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Became Public Law No: 116-6. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Great Lakes
Indiana
Lakes and rivers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Indiana
Lakes and rivers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/168/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s168/BILLS-116s168is.pdf |