US SB1693 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-19. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-19. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the National Flood Insurance Program through June 14, 2019. The bill shall take effect as if it had been enacted on May 31, 2019.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-19. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-30 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4178) |
2019-05-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4178) |
2019-05-30 | House | Mr. Evans asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2019-05-28 | House | Mr. Bishop (GA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and pass the bill, S. 1693. Mr. Massie objected to the consideration of the Senate bill. |
2019-05-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-05-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3128; text: CR S3128) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2578 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 93.
SB1520 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1533 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1520 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1533 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.