US SB1699 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9745)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9745)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2009 - Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 with respect to the state-established individual emergency unemployment compensation account (EUCA). Requires a further additional Tier-3 period for deposits to an individual's EUCA, using the current formula, if, at the time the amount added to such individual's account under the Act is exhausted or at any time thereafter, the individual's state is in an extended benefit period. Prescribes a formula for determining if a state is in an extended benefit period. Allows the Tier-3 period augmentation to be applied to the individual's EUCA only once. Authorizes a state to pay extended compensation to an otherwise eligible individual before any further additional emergency unemployment compensation (EUC), if such individual claimed extended compensation for at least one week of unemployment after the exhaustion of additional EUC. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend from 2009 through 2010 the 6.2% surtax on employers under the Federal Unemployment Tax Act (FUTA). Delays the scheduled 2010 reduction in the surtax to 6% until 2011. Amends title IV part D (Child Support and Establishment of Paternity) of the Social Security Act to require an employer to report to the state Directory of New Hires, in addition to other information, the date services for remuneration were first performed by a newly hired employee. Qualifies the requirement that an employer file new hire reports on a W-4 or equivalent form by adding the phrase "to the extent practicable." Amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise conditions for state collection of unemployment compensation debts resulting from fraud. Repeals the limitation to residents of the state seeking such an offset of the requirement that the Secretary of the Treasury reduce an individual's overpayment of federal income tax to offset any covered unemployment compensation debt the individual owes such state. (Literally, repeals the requirement that the address shown on the federal tax return for the taxable year of the overpayment be an address within the state seeking the offset.) Permits the Secretary to make such an offset regardless of whether the person resides in the state seeking it.
Title
Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Roland Burris [D-IL] | Sen. Robert Byrd [D-WV] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-23 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9745) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3404 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB3548 (Related) 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-92.
HB3756 (Related) 2009-10-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4183 (Related) 2009-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4691 (Related) 2010-03-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-144.
HB4707 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4851 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-157.
SB1647 (Related) 2009-08-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9082-9083)
SB2831 (Related) 2009-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S12325-12327)
SB3153 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 106. (consideration: CR S2094)
SB3173 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3420 (Related) 2010-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4221-4222)
HB5453 (Related) 2010-05-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB5618 (Related) 2010-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
HB5647 (Related) 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3551 (Related) 2010-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4213 (Related) 2010-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-205.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6419 (Related) 2010-11-18 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3548 (Related) 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-92.
HB3756 (Related) 2009-10-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4183 (Related) 2009-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4691 (Related) 2010-03-02 - Became Public Law No: 111-144.
HB4707 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4851 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-157.
SB1647 (Related) 2009-08-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9082-9083)
SB2831 (Related) 2009-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S12325-12327)
SB3153 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 106. (consideration: CR S2094)
SB3173 (Related) 2010-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3420 (Related) 2010-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4221-4222)
HB5453 (Related) 2010-05-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB5618 (Related) 2010-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
HB5647 (Related) 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3551 (Related) 2010-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4213 (Related) 2010-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-205.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6419 (Related) 2010-11-18 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 258 - 154 (Roll no. 579).
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employment taxes
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Income tax rates
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1699/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1699/BILLS-111s1699is.pdf |