US SB170 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the aggregate amount of a partner's annual tax deductions for qualified conservation contributions of a partnership to 2.5 times the partner's adjusted basis in the partnership. (Under current law, a "qualified conservation contribution" is the contribution of a qualified real property interest to a qualified organization exclusively for conservation purposes.) The limitation applies for the first three taxable years after the individual becomes a partner in the partnership. It does not apply to certain family partnerships.
Title
Charitable Conservation Easement Program Integrity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Same As) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB4751 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8842 (Related) 2020-12-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB4751 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8842 (Related) 2020-12-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Taxation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Taxation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/170/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s170/BILLS-116s170is.pdf |