US SB1730 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to award grants to state or local governments, Indian tribes, or nonprofit organizations to (1) implement climate-resilient living shoreline projects; and (2) encourage innovation in the use of natural materials to protect coastal communities, habitats, and natural system functions.
Title
Living Shorelines Act of 2019 Living Shorelines Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-327. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3115 (Same As) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB8632 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB8632 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Floods and storm protection
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Floods and storm protection
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection