US SB1759 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-02 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-02 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 456 North Meridian Street in Indianapolis, Indiana, as the "Richard G. Lugar Post Office Building."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 456 North Meridian Street in Indianapolis, Indiana, as the "Richard G. Lugar Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-08-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204-5205; text: CR S5205) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3152 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 248.
SB3105 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-161. (TXT | PDF)
SB3105 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-161. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
Members of Congress
Postal service
Senate
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
Members of Congress
Postal service
Senate