US SB1833 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-64.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-64.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the White County Bridge Commission to convey to the New Harmony River Bridge Authority and the New Harmony and Wabash River Bridge Authority, all right, title, and interest of the commission in and to the bridge and the approaches thereto across the Wabash River at or near New Harmony, Indiana, and in land underneath or adjacent to such bridge and its approaches. The Act of April 12, 1941, (creating the commission) is repealed effective on the date that the commission completes such conveyance.
Title
Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-64. |
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4915; text: CR S4915) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3245 (Similar To) 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-56. (TXT | PDF)