US SB1867 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to designate a senior DHS official within the Office of Strategy, Policy, and Plans as the Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems (UAS) Coordinator to oversee and coordinate with relevant DHS offices and components on the development of guidance and regulations to counter threats associated with UAS (i.e., drones). The coordinator shall serve as the principal DHS official for sharing information regarding counter-UAS technology to the private sector.
Title
DHS Countering Unmanned Aircraft Systems Coordinator Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 195. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-91. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3787 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security